MD HB589 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a specified public servant or dealer in the State from enforcing or attempting to enforce an act, a law, a statute, a rule, or a regulation of the United States government relating to a personal firearm, firearm accessory, or ammunition that is owned or manufactured commercially or privately in the State and that remains exclusively within the borders of the State; etc.
Title
Firearms Freedom Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn |
2013-02-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorney General
Crimes and Punishments
Dealers
Federal Government
General Assembly
Guns
Judges
Juries
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Safety
Registration
State Employees
Weapons
Witnesses
Crimes and Punishments
Dealers
Federal Government
General Assembly
Guns
Judges
Juries
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Safety
Registration
State Employees
Weapons
Witnesses