MD HB595 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a substance use disorder services program to submit annually to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene financial statements and salary information in accordance with the Department's regulations; requiring the Department to adjust the rate of reimbursement for specified community providers each fiscal year by the rate adjustment included in a specified State budget; providing that specified rate increases do not apply in fiscal years in which State employees do not receive a specified pay increase; etc.
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-3) (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-3) |
2016-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {136884/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Consumer Price Index
Disclosure
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Licenses
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Substance Abuse
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Consumer Price Index
Disclosure
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Licenses
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Substance Abuse