MD HB595 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain holders of manufacturer's licenses to sell and deliver certain products produced under a manufacturer's license to certain individuals located in the State under certain circumstances; and requiring by December 1, 2023, and by June 1, 2024, each holder of a manufacturer's license that has sold and delivered certain products to an individual located in the State in accordance with the Act to submit a report to the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission specifying the amount of liquor or beer shipped and delivered in the State.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses - Direct Shipments
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {853322/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {373722/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB448 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Reports
Sunset
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Reports
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |