MD HB601 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "carrier" and altering the definition of "purchaser" for the purposes of certain provisions of State insurance law governing pharmacy benefits managers to repeal the exclusion of certain persons that provide prescription drug coverage or benefits through plans subject to ERISA and to apply the provisions to certain persons that offer certain plans or programs in the State; applying the Act to certain contracts as of the first day of the first plan year beginning on or after January 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358 |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {536987/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB964 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-21 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Drugs
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Laws and Ordinances
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Revenue and Taxes
Drugs
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Laws and Ordinances
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Revenue and Taxes