MD HB602 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the University of Maryland School of Medicine to convene a workgroup that includes representatives from the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, specified experts, and interested stakeholders, to study issues related to the incidence of uterine fibroids in the State; requiring the workgroup to examine specified issues; and requiring, on or before June 30, 2016, the University of Maryland School of Medicine to report specified findings to specified committees of the General Assembly.
Title
University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine Fibroids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {406981/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |