MD HB608 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-10)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-10)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from discriminating in the sale or rental of, or otherwise making unavailable or denying, a dwelling to an individual with a disability who has, obtains, or retains a certain service dog.
Title
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Service Dogs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2023-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313829/1 Adopted |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB535 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Subjects
Disabilities
Discrimination
Dogs
Fees
Housing
Human Relations
Leases and Rent
Liability
Residential Property
Discrimination
Dogs
Fees
Housing
Human Relations
Leases and Rent
Liability
Residential Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |