MD HB614 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Council for Prince George's County, sitting as the district council, to review Planning Board decisions on site plans; authorizing a party of record to appeal specified decisions by the Planning Board to the district council; requiring the district council to decide whether to review the final approval or disapproval of a detailed site plan within 30 days from the date the final approval or disapproval was issued; authorizing the district council to revoke delegations of approval authority; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-24 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Appeals
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
Ethics
Hearings
Lobbying
Local Government Mandates
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Zoning and Planning
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
Ethics
Hearings
Lobbying
Local Government Mandates
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Zoning and Planning