MD HB615 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB826
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the procedures for dispute settlement between a council of unit owners or a board of directors and an alleged violator under the Maryland Condominium Act; establishing procedures for dispute settlement between a board of directors or other governing body and an alleged violator under the Maryland Homeowners Association Act; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB826 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 111.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |