MD HB62 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting Class L (historic) vehicles and Class N (street rod) vehicles from the requirement to display two registration plates if the front registration plate is stored inside the vehicle in a manner making the plate easily accessible for verification.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Displaying Front Registration Plate - Exemption for Class L (Historic) and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |