MD HB637 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a State's Attorney to record certain information if a State's Attorney obtains certain testimony from an in-custody witness and to report certain information to the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services; requiring the Office to securely store and maintain certain information; providing that the Office may disclose certain information only to certain persons; requiring a State's Attorney to comply with certain discovery requirements; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Sponsors
Del. Debra Davis [D] | Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Gabriel Acevero [D] | Del. Diana Fennell [D] |
Del. David Moon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 282 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {732611/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB534 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 281
Subjects
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Hearings
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Privacy
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Victims
Witnesses
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Hearings
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Privacy
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Victims
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 924 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |