MD HB653 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to allow an electric company or a gas company to apply for an alternative rate plan simultaneously with an application for new base rates; requiring the Commission to allow an electric company or a gas company to utilize an alternative rate plan covering its full cost of service to establish new base rates if the Commission finds that the plan results in a just and reasonable rate; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Companies and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Alternative Rate Plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-51) (Y: 84 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (83-51)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {833898/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback