MD HB668 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a specified Health Enterprise Zone employer a credit, in the amount of $10,000, against the State income tax for hiring a qualified position in a Health Enterprise Zone; requiring that the employer create at least one qualified position during a 24-month period; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Community Health Resources Commission, to give special consideration to specified applicants when certifying applications for specified tax credits; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Health Enterprise Zones - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-12 | House | Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {496989/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Enterprise Zones
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Comptroller
Enterprise Zones
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment