MD HB668 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include in the State budget specified funding in a specified amount for each fiscal year in which the State Department of Education receives an Expansion Grant through the federal Preschool Development Grants Program.
Title
Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-41) (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-41) (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684 |
2016-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-41) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Budgets
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Governor
Grants
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Governor
Grants