MD HB680 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a certain dispute settlement mechanism does not apply to complaints or demands arising out of a cooperative housing member's failure to pay certain assessments owed to the cooperative housing corporation; repealing a requirement that the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation hold a hearing on a certain alleged violation under certain circumstances; authorizing a member to request a hearing on a certain alleged violation within a certain time frame; etc.
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsors
Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Tawanna Gaines [D] | Del. Carolyn Howard [D] |
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] | Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-02-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Assessments
Cooperative Associations
Corporations and Associations
Courts
Eviction
Hearings
Housing
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Time
Cooperative Associations
Corporations and Associations
Courts
Eviction
Hearings
Housing
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Time