MD HB680 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations to require certain bidders, contractors, and subcontractors to pay certain employee health care expenses; requiring the Department of General Services and the Department of Transportation, by regulation, to establish certain procedures to certify that a bidder, contractor, or subcontractor pays certain employee health care expenses; authorizing a procurement officer to void a contract if a certain bidder fails to submit certain records within a reasonable period of time; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Procurement – State Funded Construction Projects – Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-32) (Y: 107 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
2019-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (31-15)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (106-32)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {716685/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback