MD HB680 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow certain individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; allowing certain individuals to claim a refund of the credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB680 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
SB719 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
SB719 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0680?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0680f.pdf |