MD HB682 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of St. Mary's County, the County Treasurer of St. Mary's County, and the State's Attorney for St. Mary's County; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |