MD HB689 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish customer choice shopping websites for electric and natural gas customers; requiring the Commission to use information from electric and natural gas suppliers to maintain the information on the websites; requiring the Commission to include a customer choice education section on its website; requiring each electricity or natural gas supplier that is actively seeking customers in a service territory to maintain at least one open offer on the Commission's website; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-04-01HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {667873/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {673696/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0689&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0689f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0689t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0689e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0689_67369601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0689_66787301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0689.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0689_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0453.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0689_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0884.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1060.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback