MD HB713 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from purchasing, selling, offering for sale, possessing with the intent to sell, or importing with the intent to sell any ivory or rhinoceros horn, subject to specified exceptions; establishing under specified circumstances a presumption that a person possesses ivory or rhinoceros horn with the intent to sell; establishing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; authorizing a court to order that a person who violates the Act pay specified restitution to be used for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Animals
Birds
Commerce and Business
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Foreign Trade
Forfeiture
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Search and Seizure
Birds
Commerce and Business
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Foreign Trade
Forfeiture
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Search and Seizure