MD HB738 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending and transferring from the State Ethics Commission to the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals jurisdiction of specified provisions of law prohibiting specified participation in procurement by a specified individual or a specified person that employs a specified individual who assists a specified executive unit in the drafting of specifications, an invitation for bids, a request for proposals for procurements, or the selections or awards made in response to an invitation for bids or a request for proposals; etc.
Title
Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in Procurement
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {964436/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {336481/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Appeals
Architects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Engineers
Ethics
Jurisdiction
Procurement
Records
State Government - Procurement
Appeals
Architects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Engineers
Ethics
Jurisdiction
Procurement
Records
State Government - Procurement