MD HB738 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a specified conviction from another state or a federal, military, or Native American tribal court may serve as a predicate crime for a specified enhanced penalty for repeat sex offenders.
Title
Criminal Law - Sex Offenses - Out-of-State Convictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |