MD HB739 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring responsibilities for sexual assault crisis programs and domestic violence programs from the Department of Human Resources to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; transferring specified appropriations held by the Department of Human Resources to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; etc.
Title
Sexual Assault Crisis Programs and Domestic Violence Programs - Transfer to the
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appropriations
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Domestic Violence
Emergencies
Grants
Human Resources, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Sexual Offenses
State Employees
Victims
Appropriations
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Domestic Violence
Emergencies
Grants
Human Resources, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Sexual Offenses
State Employees
Victims