MD HB743 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue a promoter's permit to a certain for-profit organization under certain circumstances; authorizing a permit holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at an event; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923826/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB767 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
permits
Retail Sales
Special Events
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
permits
Retail Sales
Special Events
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1011.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |