MD HB773 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that "creditable service" does not include unused sick leave with regard to determining eligibility to participate in the Deferred Retirement Option Program (DROP) by members of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; and clarifying that "creditable service" does not include unused sick leave with regard to determining the length of time members of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may participate the DROP.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Deferred Retirement Option Program -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 4/1 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2010-03-05 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-01 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Appropriations |