MD HB781 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting individuals who have successfully obtained a high school diploma by examination from certain requirements relating to the Guaranteed Access Grant, subject to certain qualifications; requiring certain individuals to meet certain qualifications under certain circumstances; altering a certain age for eligibility for the Guaranteed Access Grant under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {105567/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Committees and Commissions
Education
Examinations
Grants
Higher Education
Indigent Persons
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Education
Examinations
Grants
Higher Education
Indigent Persons
Rules and Regulations