MD HB794 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Parole and Probation to complete and submit to the Parole Commission the results of pre-parole investigations of specified inmates in local correctional facilities within 60 days of commitment for the purpose of enabling the Parole Commission to determine the advisability of granting parole to those inmates.
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Pre-Parole Investigations for Inmates of
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Michael McDermott [R] | Del. Keiffer Mitchell [D] |
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Investigations and Inquiries
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Reports
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Investigations and Inquiries
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Reports