MD HB801 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a limitation on the period of time that an eligible customer-generator may accrue generation credit and that an electric company is required to carry forward a generation credit or a negative kilowatt-hour reading; requiring a specified electric company to carry forward a generation credit in a specified manner until specified events occur; repealing a provision relating to the reversion of a generation credit to an electric company; requiring a technical working group to consider specified matters; etc.
Title
Electricity - Net Energy Metering - Credits
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Joseph Bartlett [R] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] |
Del. Peter Hammen [D] | Del. Sue Hecht [D] | Del. Carolyn Krysiak [D] | Del. Brian McHale [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Floor Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-04-03 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Energy Matters
Equipment
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Energy Matters
Equipment
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Utilities