MD HB838 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to conduct a study, in conjunction with the Maryland Health Care Commission and certain stakeholders, on the feasibility and desirability of allowing for an unregulated space for elective, self-paying patients in a hospital operating room as a pilot project; and requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to report to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee by June 30, 2021, on the results and findings of the study.
Title
Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project Study
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] | Del. Mark Chang [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Reports
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Reports