MD HB839 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1285
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $25,000 to $50,000 the cost of a public work or improvement or the purchase price of supplies or equipment for which the County Commissioners of Carroll County may enter into a contract; and requiring that when the cost of a public work or improvement or the purchase price of supplies or equipment in Carroll County exceeds $50,000 under certain conditions, the Procurement Officer for the County Commissioner shall advertise for bids for at least 1 week in a media accessible to the general public.
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchasing
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {513628/1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-22 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB437 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
HB1285 (Carry Over) 2023-02-26 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1285 (Carry Over) 2023-02-26 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Carroll County
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Prices
Procurement
Public Officials
Public Works
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Prices
Procurement
Public Officials
Public Works
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Carroll County | 3 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |