MD HB856 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law that specify the membership and govern the election of the Montgomery County Republican Party Central Committee; altering membership criteria for the Montgomery County Democratic Party Central Committee; requiring Democratic Party Central Committee members to be elected in a specified manner and limiting the number of members elected at large that may reside in the same legislative district; applying the Act to the election for Montgomery County Republican and Democratic Party Central committees; etc.
Title
Election Law - Montgomery County Republican and Democratic Party Central
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-02 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-02 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |