MD HB866 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Evaluate the Quality of Patient Care Under a Capitated Payment System; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study matters related to the impact of moving from a "per case" to a "per capita" payment model; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015; terminating the Act after June 30, 2015; etc.
Title
Task Force to Evaluate the Quality of Patient Care Under a Capitated Payment System
Sponsors
Del. Patrick McDonough [R] | Del. Glen Glass [R] | Del. Wade Kach [R] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Mental Health
Patients
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Mental Health
Patients
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset