MD HB870 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the process for determining lists of names from which the Governor will make specified appointments to the State Board of Dental Examiners; requiring candidates to submit specified forms and documents to the Board; requiring the Board to submit names to the Governor for candidates who meet requirements; prohibiting the Board from nominating specified candidates and submitting specified names to the Governor; requiring the Board to adopt regulations; etc.
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Appointments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2012-02-23 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Emergency Bills
Health Occupations
Rules and Regulations
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Emergency Bills
Health Occupations
Rules and Regulations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0870.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0870f.pdf |