MD HB870 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources, in conjunction with the Department of Agriculture, to establish a program to control the spread of black flies in the State under specified circumstances; requiring that the program be implemented initially in Washington County on State-owned property, property owned by a local government, and private property with the owner's consent; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources and the Department of Agriculture to accept, use or expend specified funding to implement the Act; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585 |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {123622/1 Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {614233/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {650419/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Environment, Department of
Gifts
Grants
Insects
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Nuisances
Pest Control
Public Information
Reports
Rivers and Streams
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Washington County
Environment, Department of
Gifts
Grants
Insects
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Nuisances
Pest Control
Public Information
Reports
Rivers and Streams
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Washington County