MD HB870 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB92
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering statutory forms for a limited and general power of attorney to include certain provisions relating to the authority of an agent to perform certain acts to assist the principal in meeting eligibility requirements and qualifying for certain governmental benefits or programs; altering a certain provision in a certain statutory form for a limited power of attorney relating to the authority of an agent to make a gift of part or all of a principal's property or to take certain action with respect to certain trusts; etc.
Title
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {422318/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | Reassigned to Judiciary |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB870 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 17 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 17 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |