MD HB874 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement that, on or before July 1, 2013, a county or municipality subject to a specified municipal stormwater permit adopt and implement laws or ordinances to establish a watershed protection and restoration program; repealing the requirement that a county or municipality maintain or administer a local watershed protection and restoration fund; repealing the requirement that a county or municipality establish and annually collect a stormwater remediation fee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2015-03-04HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback