MD HB878 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county to borrow money and incur indebtedness through the issuance and sale of notes in anticipation of the receipt of the county's allocation of funds from a certain separate account of the Bay Restoration Fund; authorizing a county to expend the net proceeds of the sale of a certain issue of notes only to make certain grants and loans or to refund one or more issues of notes; authorizing the principal of certain notes and the interest on certain notes to be paid from certain sources; etc.
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsors
Del. Mark Chang [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278 |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-13) |
2021-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {534235/1 Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-6) |
2021-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {604168/1 Adopted |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB701 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Counties
Environment
Grants
Industry and Technology
Interest
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Counties
Environment
Grants
Industry and Technology
Interest
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 19 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 19 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 19 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 19 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |