MD HB880 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 355
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 355
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "family member" for purposes of the Maryland Healthy Working Families Act to include a legal ward of an employee, a legal ward of an employee's spouse, or a legal guardian of an employee's spouse.
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Family Member - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 355 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-23) |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |