MD HB891 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirements from a minimum of 16 hours to 6 hours of instruction by a qualified handgun instructor for firearms training courses that an initial applicant for a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun must successfully complete; reducing from 8 to 2 the number of hours of instruction an applicant for renewal of a permit must successfully complete.
Title
Handgun Permits - Firearms Training Courses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario) |
2017-03-17 | House | Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Lafferty) Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |