MD HB891 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the purpose and use of the Seed Community Development Anchor Institution Fund administered by the Department of Housing and Community Development to include providing grants and loans to anchor institutions for a certain purpose in sustainable communities; and repealing a requirement that certain matching funds be from a private source.
Title
Seed Community Development Anchor Institution Fund - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Hayes) Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-6) |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB418 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Subjects
Community Development
Environmental Matters
Grants
Higher Education
Hospitals
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Environmental Matters
Grants
Higher Education
Hospitals
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |