MD HB920 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB235
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding the administration of certain personnel matters from the definition of "administrative function" as it relates to the Open Meetings Act.
Title
Open Meetings Act - Definition - Administrative Function
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB920 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Annotated Code of Maryland
Laws and Ordinances
meetings
Open Government
Privacy
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Annotated Code of Maryland
Laws and Ordinances
meetings
Open Government
Privacy
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 3 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |