MD HB923 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the property tax imposed on owner- occupied residential real property located in specified neighborhood conservation areas; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to adopt regulations that establish application procedures for the designation of specified neighborhood conservation areas; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Neighborhood Conservation Act of 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 905267/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Community Development
Conservation
Counties
Disclosure
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Conservation
Counties
Disclosure
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits