MD HB924 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of specified provisions of law relating to reducing lead risk in housing; requiring specified owners to register specified properties built between January 1, 1950 and December 31, 1977, both inclusive, in a specified manner; providing civil penalties for registration violations; providing a registration fee for specified property; etc.
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Applicability and Registration Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] |
Del. Herbert McMillan [R] | Sen. Wayne Norman [R] | Del. Michael Weir [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-12 | House | Reassigned to Environmental Matters |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Environment
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Registration
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Registration