MD HB933 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to increase the rate of the transfer tax imposed on certain written instruments conveying title to property or a leasehold interest in real property, subject to a certain exception; requiring any revenue derived from a higher transfer tax rate to be distributed to a certain special fund; establishing a Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund and requiring that certain revenue attributable to certain transfer and recordation tax rates be paid into the fund; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment 333923/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 143122/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 88 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 133628/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 89 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment 333923/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 143122/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 88 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 133628/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 89 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {333923/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-39) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {143122/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (43-88) |
2021-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {133628/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (38-89) |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {310112/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-19 | House | Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Holmes) Adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-24 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB566 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-17 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Housing
Land Records
Local Government Mandates
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Housing
Land Records
Local Government Mandates
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Arundel County | 4 | 11-111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Anne Arundel County | 4 | 11-122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Anne Arundel County | 4 | 3A-102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |