MD HB940 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-21 - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-21 - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person to obtain a kennel license if the person owns or has custody of 15 or more unspayed female dogs over the age of 6 months kept for the purpose of breeding the dogs and selling their offspring and sells dogs from six or more litters in a year; requiring each county to collect and maintain specified information for each kennel license issued; requiring each county to report specified information to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation on or before January 15 each year; etc.
Title
Counties - Kennel Licenses - Requirements for Breeders
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Del. William Frick [D] |
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (132-7) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Economic Matters |