MD HB946 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to issue up to five Class B-DD (Development District) beer, wine, and liquor licenses for restaurants located within the Main Street Laurel development.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Main Street Laurel Development PG 404-23
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {723827/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Restaurants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1614 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |