MD HB960 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB640
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law requring a District Court judge to assign, if practicable, an offender to work the public roads of Frederick County or the City of Frederick as a penalty for a violation of a municipal law or ordinance of the City of Frederick.
Title
City of Frederick - Assignment of Offenders to Road Work - Repeal
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB640 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1154 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
SB1154 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Corrections
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Frederick County
Highways
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Public Works
Sheriffs
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Frederick County
Highways
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Public Works
Sheriffs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 9 | 518 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |