MD HB979 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the requirement to obtain a certain entertainment permit does not apply to the holder of a certain license under certain circumstances; authorizing a certain license holder to offer entertainment when persons under the age of 21 years are on the licensed premises if the license holder enters into a certain agreement with certain persons and the lease of the property on which the licensed premises is located contains certain provisions; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB739 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Health
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Minors
Motion Pictures
Notices
Prince George's County
Restaurants
Safety
Special Events
State Universities and Colleges
Theaters
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Health
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Minors
Motion Pictures
Notices
Prince George's County
Restaurants
Safety
Special Events
State Universities and Colleges
Theaters
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1616 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |