MD HB98 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period before a license expires by which the Board of Examiners of Psychologists is required to send a renewal notice to a licensee; requiring the Board, under specified circumstances, to send a renewal notice by electronic means to a specified electronic mail address of a licensee; requiring each licensee to notify the Board in writing of any change in address or electronic mail address within 30 days after the change occurs; etc.
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License Renewal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-01-24 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Psychologists
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Psychologists
Telecommunications and Information Technology