MD HB989 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue a Class B-MGC (miniature golf course) beer, wine, and liquor license to a miniature golf course under certain circumstances; authorizing a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption under certain circumstances; requiring a license holder to submit an annual gross sales report for alcohol, golf games and food to the Board before a license may be renewed; and providing an annual license fee of $1,500.
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Miniature Golf Course License
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1009.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |