MD HB994 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person notifying the one-call system before performing an excavation or demolition to select a specific start work date; altering the information that must be provided to a one-call system; requiring the ticket generated by the one-call system to include a response date and time that corresponds with the start work date selected by the person; altering the time frame during which a ticket is valid; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Underground Facilities - One-Call System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {113225/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB789 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 12 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 12 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |